EP4102727 - METHOD, REMOTE DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMISION COMPATIBLE WITH TWO TDD SWITCH SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROSE Technologies (Suzhou) Co., Ltd. No. 6, Shen'An Road Dianshanhu Village Kunshan Suzhou, Jiangsu 215345 / CN | [2023/07] |
Former [2022/50] | For all designated states ROSENBERGER TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. 6 Shenan Road Dianshanhu Village, Kunshan Suzhou, Jiangsu 215345 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jing Jiangsu, 215345 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Wei Jiangsu, 215345 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Hang Jiangsu, 215345 / CN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21196756.7 | 15.09.2021 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | CN202110652959 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110652959 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102727 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/44, H04L5/14, H04W72/04 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H04B1/44 (EP,KR);
H04L5/1469 (EP,KR);
G05B19/0423 (CN);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
G05B2219/23051 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ENTFERNTE VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR MIT ZWEI TDD-SCHALTERSIGNALEN KOMPATIBLE ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/50] | English: | METHOD, REMOTE DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMISION COMPATIBLE WITH TWO TDD SWITCH SIGNALS | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF DISTANT ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION COMPATIBLES AVEC DEUX SIGNAUX DE COMMUTATION TDD | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 27.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009318089 (STRATFORD SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]US2020137709 (KIM WAN-JONG [CA], et al); | [A]US2020322811 (KANG SANGWOOK [KR], et al); | [A]CN112532333 (COMBA TELECOM SYS CHINA CO LTD) |