EP3974588 - RECESSABLE BOX FOR HOUSING HYDRAULIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.B.M. S.p.A. Via Industriale 23 Località S. Giovanni 25060 Polaveno (BS) / IT | [2023/34] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states RBM IBOX S.R.L. Via Industriale snc. 25075 Nave (BS) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSINI, Guido 25075 NAVE (BS) / IT | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Corso Magenta, 56 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21198886.0 | 24.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | IT20200022721 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: IT202000022721 | [2022/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974588 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E03B7/09, E03C1/02, E04F19/08, F24D19/00 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
E03B7/095 (EP);
E04F19/08 (CN);
F16L5/00 (US);
E03C1/021 (EP,US);
E04F19/086 (EP);
F24D19/0097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINBAUKASTEN ZUR AUFNAHME VON HYDRAULIKKOMPONENTEN | [2022/13] | English: | RECESSABLE BOX FOR HOUSING HYDRAULIC COMPONENTS | [2022/13] | French: | BOÎTE ENCASTRABLE POUR BOÎTIER DE COMPOSANTS HYDRAULIQUES | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 30.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9410742U (KAMO WAERMETECHNISCHE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2,7,8; | [XA]DE29910567U (JORDAN PAUL ELTECH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 20 * * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 2; figures 1-4 * [A] 4,7,8; | [X]EP2896756 (EASY SANITARY SOLUTIONS BV [NL]) [X] 1* column 5, paragraph 52 - paragraph 56; figure 5 *; | [XAI]EP3524738 (GEBERIT INT AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, paragraph 10 - column 3, paragraph 16 * * column 5, paragraph 26 - column 8, paragraph 38; figure - * [A] 7 [I] 8 |