EP3955496 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING PACKETS IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Soeng-Hun Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
Van Lieshout, Gert Jan Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Hwan-Joon Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
Lee, Ju-Ho Suwon-si / KR | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21199368.8 | 07.08.2008 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | KR20070079246 | 07.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070079246 | KR20070113640 | 08.11.2007 Original published format: KR 20070113640 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955496 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3955496 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (KR);
H04L1/1628 (KR);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1845 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (KR);
H04W72/04 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/21] |
Former [2022/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING PACKETS IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST | [2022/07] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING PACKETS IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST | [2022/07] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA TRANSMISSION ET LA RÉCEPTION DE PAQUETS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE PRENANT EN CHARGE UNE REQUÊTE DE RÉPÉTITION AUTOMATIQUE HYBRIDE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 19.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08014152.6 / EP2023523 | EP17156090.7 / EP3200379 | Divisional application(s) | EP23191112.4 / EP4250614 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2348665 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [E] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0084] , [0085] *; | [E]EP2587706 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [E] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 4 ** paragraph [0064] * | Examination | - ERICSSON, "Handling of HARQ retransmissions for LTE uplink", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-072580, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Orlando, USA; 20070622, XP050135391 |