EP3922950 - ROAD INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Tongbin BEIJING, 100085 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Jizhou BEIJING, 100085 / CN | 03 /
XIA, Deguo BEIJING, 100085 / CN | 04 /
DONG, Yongyan BEIJING, 100085 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Jianzhong BEIJING, 100085 / CN | 06 /
LU, Zhen BEIJING, 100085 / CN | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21200555.7 | 01.10.2021 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | CN20201190909 | 13.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011090909 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3922950 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3922950 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G01C21/36, G01C21/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G01C21/3811 (EP);
G01C21/3822 (KR);
G06V20/584 (EP,CN,KR);
G08G1/096844 (US);
G01C21/3461 (EP,CN,KR);
G01C21/3602 (EP,KR);
G01C21/367 (KR);
G06V10/809 (EP);
G06V20/588 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRASSENINFORMATIONVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -EINRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROGRAMM | [2022/01] | English: | ROAD INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ROUTIÈRES, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2022/01] |
Former [2021/50] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄTE ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON STRASSENINFORMATIONEN, ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT, SPEICHERMITTEL UND PROGRAMM | ||
Former [2021/50] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DES INFORMATIONS ROUTIERES, DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET PROGRAMME | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2009192704 (GEELEN PIETER [NL]) [Y] 6,12 * paragraph [0052] *[A] 5,11; | [XYI]US2016097644 (STRASSENBURG-KLECIAK MAREK [DE]) [X] 1,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0036] , [0049] , [0051] , [0067] , [0074] , [0102] , [0126] - [0128] * [Y] 3,4,6,9,10,12 [I] 5,11; | [Y]US2017011270 (KAMADA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [Y] 3,9 * paragraph [0073] *; | [Y]CN109099903 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 4,10 * paragraph [0063] *; | [XYI]WO2020042348 (CHUSUDU SUZHOU TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0073] , [0075] , [0078] , [0122] , [0128] , [0141] * [Y] 3,9 [I] 2,8 |