EP4000481 - LONGITUDINAL BURN POT ASSEMBLY AND IMPROVED AIR FLOW SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dansons US, LLC 3411 N. 5th Ave., Suite 500 Phoenix, AZ 85013 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, Jay Tempe, 85283 / US | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21205639.4 | 29.10.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | US202017088074 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: US202017088074 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000481 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/07 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A47J37/0754 (EP,US);
F24B5/026 (US);
A23B4/044 (US);
A23B4/0523 (US);
A47J37/0704 (EP,US);
F23N3/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÄNGSBRENNKAMMERANORDNUNG UND VERBESSERTES LUFTSTROMSYSTEM | [2022/21] | English: | LONGITUDINAL BURN POT ASSEMBLY AND IMPROVED AIR FLOW SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | ENSEMBLE POT DE COMBUSTION LONGITUDINAL ET SYSTÈME D'ÉCOULEMENT D'AIR AMÉLIORÉ | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 26.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US7637258 (COSGROVE BARRY [CA]) [X] 1-3,9-12 * column 6, line 16 - line 47 * * page 10, line 33 - line 41 * * figures 1,2A,2B * [A] 4-8,13-15; | [A]US9844300 (CEDAR JONATHAN N [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 9 *; | [A]US2018084945 (AOYAMA MASANORI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0143] - [0150] * * figure 17 *; | [A]KR101987880B (HWANG JONG DAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0041] , [0045] * * figures 4,6,8,9 * |