EP3973818 - DRAWER SIDE WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRGANG, Markus 6844 Altach / AT | 02 /
KAMPL, Markus 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21208257.2 | 10.01.2019 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | AT20180050102 | 01.02.2018 Original published format: AT 501022018 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973818 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/90 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
A47B88/941 (EP,US);
A47B2088/902 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | SCHUBLADENSEITENWAND | [2022/13] | English: | DRAWER SIDE WALL | [2022/13] | French: | PAROI LATÉRALE DE TIROIR | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19701958.1 / EP3745919 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1378237 (D ART DE COURTRAI DE COENE FRE) [X] 1-11* figures 1-9 *; | [X]US3416850 (HILFINGER GEORGE C, et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 5 *; | [X]FR2505635 (PERSTORP AB [SE]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE202010007427U (GRASS GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO2012068604 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2013049560 (LIU JACK [TW]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-7 * |