EP4054201 - CODING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / NL | ||
Former [2022/36] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Mr. Treublaan 7 1097 DP Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Lihua Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Jiancong Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 03 /
YIN, Peng Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 04 /
YANG, Jiheng Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/36] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Mr Treublaan 7 1097 DP Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 21214034.7 | 07.04.2008 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US20070923993P | 18.04.2007 Original published format: US 923993 P | US20070824006 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: US 824006 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054201 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4054201 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/434 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04N21/434 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/70 (KR);
H04N19/30 (KR);
H04N19/50 (KR);
H04N21/234 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KODIERUNGSSYSTEME | [2022/36] | English: | CODING SYSTEMS | [2022/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CODAGE | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08742644.1 / EP2147555 | EP12165846.2 / EP2528340 | EP17166196.0 / EP3264780 | EP20162659.5 / EP3700221 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |