EP4202551 - METHODS OF DETERMINING A MECHANICAL PROPERTY OF A LAYER APPLIED TO A SUBSTRATE, AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Huaichen 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
TIMOSHKOV, Vadim Yourievich 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
TABERY, Cyrus, Emil San Jose, 95134 / US | 04 /
HAUPTMANN, Marc 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 05 /
KHODKO, Oleksandr 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21217598.8 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202551 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, H01L21/66 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G03F7/70491 (EP);
G03F7/70633 (EP);
G03F7/706839 (EP);
G03F7/70783 (EP);
H01L22/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER MECHANISCHEN EIGENSCHAFT EINER AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT AUFGEBRACHTEN SCHICHT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/26] | English: | METHODS OF DETERMINING A MECHANICAL PROPERTY OF A LAYER APPLIED TO A SUBSTRATE, AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE PROPRIÉTÉ MÉCANIQUE D'UNE COUCHE APPLIQUÉE SUR UN SUBSTRAT, ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2018342410 (HOOGE JOSHUA [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,12-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0025] - [0037] - [0041] - [0043] - [0047] - [0 58] - [0062] - [0 73] - [0081] - [0088] - [0096]; figures 1,3,4,5; claims 1,4-6 *[A] 9-11; | [XAYI] - VAN HAREN RICHARD ET AL, "Intra-field stress impact on global wafer deformation", SPIE PROCEEDINGS; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, US, (20190326), vol. 10959, doi:10.1117/12.2515391, ISBN 978-1-5106-3673-6, pages 109591I - 109591I, XP060119199 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12-14 * abstract * * pages 8-11 * * pages 4-6 * [A] 9-11 [Y] 1-8,12-15 [I] 3,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2515391 |