EP4079327 - PAYLOADS FOR DRUG-CONJUGATES AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centaurus Polytherapeutics 4, Square Vermenouze 75005 Paris / FR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skerdi, HAVIARI PARIS / FR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 21305529.6 | 22.04.2021 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079327 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/64, A61K47/65, A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61K47/64 (EP);
A61K47/65 (EP);
A61K47/6803 (EP);
A61K47/6809 (EP);
A61K47/6889 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUTZLASTEN FÜR ARZNEIMITTELKONJUGATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2022/43] | English: | PAYLOADS FOR DRUG-CONJUGATES AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING CANCER | [2022/43] | French: | CHARGES UTILES POUR CONJUGUÉS DE MÉDICAMENTS ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4952394 (SENTER PETER D [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12-15 * figures 1-2 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 42 * * column 3, line 49 * * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 40 * * column 7, line 41 - line 43 * [I] 11; | [XI]US6214345 (FIRESTONE RAYMOND ARMAND [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * page 3, line 35 - line 54 * * page 4, line 35 - line 45 * * page 6, line 18 - line 32 * * page 9, line 45 * * page 10, line 1 * * page 10, line 17 - line 49 * * schemes 13 and 17 * * page 19, line 3 - page 23, line 37 *[I] 7; | [X]US2007276018 (VITE GREGORY D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0289] - paragraph [0291] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2014096551 (GLYKOS FINLAND OY [FI]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-15 * page 1, line 20 - line 24 * * page 36, line 21 - page 37, line 31 * * examples 3, 9, 10 * [I] 7,11 | by applicant | JP2002060351 | US2003187039 | WO03084919 | US8129407 | WO2015063331 | EP3342785 | - TAE JIN KIM et al., Cancer Research 2007, (20071001), vol. 67, no. 19 | - FARQUHAR et al., J. Med. Chem., (19980000), vol. 41, pages 965 - 972 | - KRZYWIK et al., Molecules, (20200000), vol. 25, page 3540 | - KENNETH R. KUNZ et al., J. Med. Chem., (19910000), vol. 34, pages 2281 - 2286 | - ROBERT T. DORR, Cancer Chemother Pharmacol, (19920000), vol. 31, pages 1 - 5 | - C. SESSA, Annals of Oncology, (20070000), vol. 18, pages 1548 - 1553 | - ZASK et al., J Med Chem, (20040000), vol. 47, pages 4774 - 4786 | - Polym. Chem., (20110000), vol. 2, pages 773 - 790 | - YVES MEYER et al., Org. Biomol. Chem., (20100000), vol. 8, pages 1777 - 1780 | - STEPHANOPOULOSFRANCIS, Nat. Chem. Biol., (20111115), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 876 - 84 | - KALIARAINES, Curr Org Chem, (20100100), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 138 - 147 | - OLAFSEN et al., Protein Eng. Design & Sel., (20040000), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 315 - 323 | - HUSE et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 246, pages 1274 - 1281 | - NIU et al., Bioorg Med Chem Lett, (20100000), vol. 20, pages 1535 - 1538 | - VYAS et al., J. Org. Chem., (19860000), vol. 51, no. 22, pages 3196 - 4309 | - HONARVAR et al., Scientific Reports, (20180000), vol. 8, no. 2998 | - KERN et al., J Am Chem Soc, (20160000), vol. 138, no. 4, pages 1430 - 1445 |