blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4198763

EP4198763 - OPTIMIZING SPARQL QUERIES IN A DISTRIBUTED GRAPH DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.12.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dassault Systèmes
10, rue Marcel Dassault
78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR
[2023/25]
Inventor(s)01 / LABBATE, Frédéric
78946 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR
02 / SAHUT D'IZARN, Jean-Philippe
78946 Vélizy-Villacoublay Cedex / FR
03 / ROULLIER, Alban
Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR
04 / TEWKSBARY, David Edward
Waltham / US
 [2023/25]
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
11 rue Christophe Colomb
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2023/25]Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date21306834.917.12.2021
[2023/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4198763
Date:21.06.2023
Language:EN
[2023/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2022
ClassificationIPC:G06F16/2453, G06F16/2452, G06F16/901, G06F16/80
[2023/25]
CPC:
G06F16/80 (EP); G06F16/9032 (CN); G06F16/24537 (US);
G06F16/2452 (EP); G06F16/2453 (EP); G06F16/24565 (US);
G06F16/9024 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/05]
Former [2023/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERUNG VON SPARQL-ANFRAGEN IN EINER VERTEILTEN GRAPHENDATENBANK[2023/25]
English:OPTIMIZING SPARQL QUERIES IN A DISTRIBUTED GRAPH DATABASE[2023/25]
French:OPTIMISATION DE REQUÊTES SPARQL DANS UNE BASE DE DONNÉES GRAPHIQUE DISTRIBUÉE[2023/25]
Examination procedure21.12.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2023Examination requested  [2024/05]
21.12.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]EP3267330  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LTD [IE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0086] *;
 [I]CN109710638  (UNIV HUNAN) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]CN110825738  (UNIV TIANJIN) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - AMARNATH GUPTA ET AL, On Querying OBO Ontologies Using a DAG Pattern Query Language, DATA INTEGRATION IN THE LIFE SCIENCES LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;LECTURE NOTES IN BIOINFORMATICS;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 152 - 167, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-36593-8, XP019037222 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicant   - PENG et al., VLDB Journal, (20160000), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 243 - 268
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.