EP4090647 - PRODUCTION OF MONO-ETHYLENE GLYCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Alvar Aallon katu 1 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMPER, Juha Holamäentie 3 54930 Levänen / FI | 02 /
TURUNEN, Sami Variksenmarjankatu 5 53500 Lappeenranta / FI | 03 /
NISSINEN, Vilho Päihänniementie 261 54960 Vehkataipale / FI | 04 /
LAITILA, Mika Laukkatie 19 13130 Hämeenlinna / FI | 05 /
SALMINEN, Jere Rietinkatu 5 A9 53100 Lappeenranta / FI | 06 /
VENTOLA, Meri Zschochersche Strasse 75 04229 Leipzig / DE | 07 /
HEIMING, Nina Meisenweg 4 46509 Xanten / DE | 08 /
WEIGAND, Lisa Frankfurter Straße 15 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21703496.6 | 08.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021FI50008 | Priority number, date | FI20200005037 | 15.01.2020 Original published format: FI 20205037 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021144499 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090647 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/132, C07C31/20, C08H8/00, C12P19/02 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C12P19/14 (EP,KR);
C07C31/202 (FI);
C12P7/10 (KR,US);
B01J8/00 (FI);
C07C29/132 (EP);
C07C29/151 (FI);
C08H8/00 (EP,KR);
C12N9/2402 (FI,US);
C12P7/02 (FI);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/132, C07C31/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON MONOETHYLENGLYKOL | [2022/47] | English: | PRODUCTION OF MONO-ETHYLENE GLYCOL | [2022/47] | French: | PRODUCTION DE MONO-ÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Observations by third parties | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 11.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2012323051 (POWELL JOSEPH BROUN [US]) [X] 20 * examples 5,6 *[A] 1-19; | [XA]US2015057469 (ZHANG TAO [CN], et al) [X] 20 * examples 3,4 * [A] 1-19 |