EP4107160 - MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theseus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 210 Broadway Suite 201 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Wei-Sheng c/o Theseus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 210 Broadway, Suite 201 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
SHAKESPEARE, William C. c/o Theseus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 210 Broadway, Suite 201 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
EYERMANN, Charles J. c/o Theseus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 210 Broadway, Suite 201 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
DALGARNO, David C. c/o Theseus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 210 Broadway, Suite 201 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21710844.8 | 18.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021US18520 | Priority number, date | US202062978202P | 18.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062978202 P | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021168074 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107160 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/22, C07D513/22, A61K31/395, A61P35/00 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C07D498/22 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR);
C07D513/22 (EP,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | 13.09.2022 | ME | 13.09.2022 | Validation states | KH | 13.09.2022 | MA | 13.09.2022 | MD | 13.09.2022 | TN | 13.09.2022 | Title | German: | MAKROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/52] | English: | MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2022/52] | French: | COMPOSÉS MACROCYCLIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 13.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014210354 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-58,67-98 * page 1, line 7 - line 8; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2019121562 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-58,67-98 * page 1, line 3 - line 6; claim 1 *; | [A] - BRYAN K. CHAN ET AL, "Discovery of a Noncovalent, Mutant-Selective Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor Inhibitor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20160912), vol. 59, no. 19, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.6b00995, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 9080 - 9093, XP055497250 [A] 1-58,67-98 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.6b00995 | by applicant | US4933294 | WO9105264 | US5401638 | WO9845479 | - CHONG et al., Nature Med, (20130000), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 1389 - 1400 | - S. M. BERGE et al., J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - SIAS et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19900000), vol. 132, page 73 | - SINGER et al., Methods in Molec. Biol., (20010000), vol. 181, page 145 | - SHEFFIELD et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, page 2766 | - YAP et al., Nucl. Acids. Res., (19910000), vol. 19, page 4294 |