EP4150360 - CORRECTION OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGES USING MULTIPLE MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM CONFIGURATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUELKE, Christophe, Michael, Jean 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SOMMER, Karsten 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
DUENSING, George, Randall 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
BOERNERT, Peter 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21719164.2 | 21.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021EP60286 | Priority number, date | US202063022925P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022925 P | EP20200176989 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20176989 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021228515 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150360 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/56, A61B5/055, G01R33/561, G01R33/565, G06N3/08, G01R33/48, G01R33/567 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G01R33/5608 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (US);
A61B5/055 (EP);
G01R33/4818 (EP);
G01R33/543 (US);
G01R33/561 (EP);
G01R33/565 (US);
G01R33/56509 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06T11/006 (US);
A61B5/0042 (EP);
G01R33/5611 (EP);
G01R33/56554 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | KORREKTUR VON MAGNETRESONANZBILDERN UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRERER KONFIGURATIONEN VON MAGNETRESONANZBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2023/12] | English: | CORRECTION OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGES USING MULTIPLE MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM CONFIGURATIONS | [2023/12] | French: | CORRECTION D'IMAGES PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE À L'AIDE DE MULTIPLES CONFIGURATIONS DE SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 12.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019224800 (MAHAJAN VIDUR [IN], et al); | by applicant | WO2019224800 | US2019377047 |