EP4143003 - ROTATING FLUID DISTRIBUTOR AND DEVICE FOR TREATING THE INSIDE OF A PREFORM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A ROTATING FLUID DISTRIBUTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROUILLET, Mickael 76930 OCTEVILLE-SUR-MER / FR | 02 /
QUETEL, François 76930 OCTEVILLE-SUR-MER / FR | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Sidel Group c/o Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-mer / FR | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21720276.1 | 22.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021EP60481 | Priority number, date | FR20200004273 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2004273 | [2023/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219472 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143003 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4143003 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, B08B5/02, B29C49/28, F15B13/04, F15B13/07 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B29C49/4252 (EP);
B08B5/02 (EP);
B29C49/28 (EP);
B29C49/42416 (EP);
B29C49/4289 (EP);
F15B13/0406 (EP);
F15B13/07 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTIERENDER FLUIDVERTEILER UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INNENBEHANDLUNG EINER VORFORM MIT SOLCH EINEM ROTIERENDEN FLUIDVERTEILER | [2023/10] | English: | ROTATING FLUID DISTRIBUTOR AND DEVICE FOR TREATING THE INSIDE OF A PREFORM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A ROTATING FLUID DISTRIBUTOR | [2023/10] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR FLUIDIQUE TOURNANT ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INTERIEUR D'UNE PREFORME EQUIPE D'UN TEL DISTRIBUTEUR FLUIDIQUE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10240852 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]FR2937889 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR]) [A] 9-11* abstract *; | [A]FR3054474 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR]) [A] 9-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2019249787 (WHITAKER CARL T [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |