EP4138799 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITING ENVELOPED VIRUSES USING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2023/20] |
Former [2023/09] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNING, Elizabeth 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 02 /
CAPONE, Kimberly 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 03 /
GANDOLFI, Lisa 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 04 /
GEONNOTTI, Anthony Robert 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 05 /
EKMAN-GUNN, Euen Thomas Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 06 /
JOHNSON, Diana Roshek 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 07 /
KIRCHNER, Frank J. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08858 / US | 08 /
MOSES, Selina 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 09 /
SANTORA, Delores 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 10 /
WALTERS, Russel 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 11 /
SUN, Frank C. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21721205.9 | 19.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021IB53202 | Priority number, date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 Original published format: US202016856735 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021214624 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138799 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/085, A61K31/78, A61P31/12, A61P31/14, A61P31/18, A61P31/20, A61P31/22 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/78 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/085 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61P31/12 (EP,KR);
A61P31/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (US);
A61P31/18 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP,US);
A61P31/22 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/085, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/78, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG VON UMHÜLLTEN VIREN MIT HYDROPHOB MODIFIZIERTEN POLYMEREN MIT NIEDRIGEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [2023/09] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITING ENVELOPED VIRUSES USING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED POLYMERS | [2023/09] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR INHIBER DES VIRUS ENVELOPPÉS FAISANT INTERVENIR DES POLYMÈRES HYDROPHOBIQUEMENT MODIFIÉS DE FAIBLE MASSE MOLÉCULAIRE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 22.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005074947 (CHEN ANDREW XIAN [US]) [X] 1-6,8-22 * page 9, lines 1-6 * * page 33; claim 1 * * page 34; claim 17 * * page 35; claims 21, 24, 25, 27 * * page 36; claims 28-31, 36, 37 * * page 18, lines 38-45 ** page 19, lines 25-30 *; | [XI]US2005244365 (LABIB MOHAMED E [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11-17,20-22 * pages 26-29; claims 1-83 * * page 19; table 1 * * page 22; table 2 * * page 16, paragraph 146 * * page 15, paragraph 143 * * page 16, paragraph 149 * [I] 7; | [X]US2014234249 (CAPONE KIMBERLY [US], et al) [X] 18,19,22-25 * page 1, paragraph 10 * * pages 6, 7; claims 1, 7, 9-12 * * page 5, paragraph 51 * * page 4, paragraph 48 * | by applicant | US3755560 | US4421769 | US6433061 | US7157414 | US7803403 | US7892525 | US8025902 | US8293845 | US8329626 | US8329627 | US8343902 | US9068148 | US2016262999 | US9931290 | US10435308 | US10517806 | - ROBERTSON et al., "Recombination in AIDS viruses", Journal of Molecular Evolution, (19950300), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 249 - 59 | - LIU et al., "Research and Development on Therapeutic Agents and Vaccines for COVID-19 and Related Human Coronavirus Diseases", ACS Cent. Sci., (20200000), vol. 6, doi:10.1021/acscentsci.0c00272, pages 315 - 331, XP055724944 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acscentsci.0c00272 | - CAS, no. 131707-23-8 | - BLAISING et al., "Arbidol as a broad-spectrum antiviral: An update", Antiviral Research, (20140000), vol. 107, doi:10.1016/j.antiviral.2014.04.006, pages 84 - 94, XP028852047 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2014.04.006 | - KADAM et al., "Structural basis of influenza virus fusion inhibition by the antiviral drug Arbidol", PNAS, (20170110), vol. 114, no. 2, doi:10.1073/pnas.1617020114, pages 206 - 214, XP055737027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1617020114 | - MENACHERY et al., Pathogenic Influenza Viruses and Coronaviruses Utilize Similar and Contrasting Approaches To Control Interferon-Stimulated Gene Responses, American Society of Microbiology, (20140000), vol. 5, pages 1 - 11 | - LI, "Structure, Function and Evolution of Coronavirus Spike Proteins", Annu. Rev. Virul., (20160000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 237 - 261 | - SAGARIN, Cosmetics, Science and Technology, (19720000), vol. 1, pages 72 - 73 | - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, The Cosmetic, Toiletry, and Fragrance Assoc., (19970000), pages 1656 - 61,1626,1654-55 | - McCutcheon's Detergents and Emulsifiers, (19860000), pages 1693 - 1697 | - ICI Handbook, pages 1673 - 1686 |