blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4147084

EP4147084 - APPARATUS FOR COUPLING LIGHT INTO AN OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.04.2025
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.11.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.05.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2025First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita Degli Studi Del Sannio Di Benevento
Piazza Guerrazzi 1
82100 Benevento / IT
For all designated states
Universität Stuttgart
Keplerstrasse 7
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[2023/11]
Inventor(s)01 / PORTALUPI, Simone Luca
70180 Stuttgart / DE
02 / MICHLER, Peter
70806 Komwestheim / DE
03 / JETTER, Michael
72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE
04 / WITZ, Norbert
73344 Gruibingen / DE
05 / CUSANO, Andrea
81100 Caserta / IT
06 / CUTOLO, Antonello
80075 Forio (NA) / IT
07 / MICCO, Alberto
82100 Benevento / IT
08 / RICCIARDI, Armando
82100 Benevento / IT
 [2023/11]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/11]Meyer, Florian Alexander Marius, et al
Meissner Bolte
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date21723099.410.05.2021
[2023/11]
WO2021EP62291
Priority number, dateIT2020001033608.05.2020         Original published format: IT202000010336
[2023/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021224504
Date:11.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4147084
Date:15.03.2023
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2023/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.2021
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/42
[2023/11]
CPC:
G02B6/4274 (EP); G02B6/4202 (EP); G02B6/4212 (EP);
G02B6/4224 (EP); G02B6/4236 (EP); G02B6/4238 (EP);
G02B6/4239 (EP); G02B6/4245 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/11]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINKOPPLUNG VON LICHT IN EINE OPTISCHE FASER[2023/11]
English:APPARATUS FOR COUPLING LIGHT INTO AN OPTICAL FIBER[2023/11]
French:APPAREIL DE COUPLAGE DE LUMIÈRE DANS UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE[2023/11]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2022National basic fee paid 
01.12.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2022Examination requested  [2023/11]
01.12.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6263002  (HSU KEVIN [US], et al);
 [XYI]US2011194820  (SAKURAI WATARU [JP], et al);
by applicantUS6263002
 US2011194820
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.