blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4147155

EP4147155 - SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING, LOCALIZING AND STORING HISTOLOGY CASSETTES AND SLIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.11.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 21.05.2025 [2025/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IT HEALTH FUSION S.R.L.
Via Alessandro Manzoni, 1
80123 Napoli / IT
For all designated states
Castaldi, Giuseppe
Corso del Progresso, 46
82021 Apice / IT
For all designated states
Cutolo, Antonello
Via Zaro, 7
80075 Forio / IT
For all designated states
Galdi, Vincenzo
Via Mariano Russo, 33D
82100 Benevento / IT
For all designated states
Mattera, Paolo
Via Porta Rufina, 24
82100 Benevento / IT
For all designated states
Parente, Roberto
Via Cesine di Sopra, 573
82032 Cerreto Sannita / IT
For all designated states
Cusano, Andrea
Via Ferrarecce, 75
81100 Caserta / IT
[2023/11]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSIELLO, Davide
80128 Napoli / IT
02 / ARMENANTE, Antonio
84013 Cava de' Tirreni / IT
03 / ROSIELLO, Fernando
80128 Napoli / IT
04 / DI MINNO, Alessandro
80129 Napoli / IT
05 / CASTALDI, Giuseppe
82021 Apice / IT
06 / CUTOLO, Antonello
80075 Forio-Ischia / IT
07 / GALDI, Vincenzo
82100 Benevento / IT
08 / MATTERA, Paolo
82100 Benevento / IT
09 / PARENTE, Roberto
82032 Cerreto Sannita / IT
10 / CUSANO, Andrea
81100 Caserta / IT
 [2023/11]
Representative(s)de Alteriis, Renato, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Viale Achille Papa, 30
20149 Milano / IT
[2023/11]
Application number, filing date21727556.904.05.2021
[2023/11]
WO2021IB53729
Priority number, dateIT2020000970604.05.2020         Original published format: IT202000009706
[2023/11]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021224788
Date:11.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4147155
Date:15.03.2023
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2023/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4147155
Date:14.08.2024
Language:EN
[2024/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.2021
ClassificationIPC:G06K7/10, B01L9/00, B01L9/04, B01L1/04, B01L3/00
[2024/12]
CPC:
G06K7/10 (EP); G06K19/07758 (US); B01L3/545 (EP,US);
B01L9/523 (EP); G06K19/07713 (US); G06K7/10356 (EP,US);
B01L1/04 (EP); B01L2300/022 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2023/11]G06K7/10, B01L9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/11]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG, LOKALISIERUNG UND LAGERUNG VON HISTOLOGIEKASSETTEN UND -OBJEKTTRÄGERN[2023/11]
English:SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING, LOCALIZING AND STORING HISTOLOGY CASSETTES AND SLIDES[2023/11]
French:SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION, DE LOCALISATION ET DE STOCKAGE DE CASSETTES ET DE LAMES D'HISTOLOGIE[2023/11]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2022National basic fee paid 
05.12.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2022Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.12.2022Examination requested  [2023/11]
05.12.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.06.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2024Fee for grant paid
01.07.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR14.08.2024
PL14.08.2024
SM14.08.2024
NO14.11.2024
RS14.11.2024
GR15.11.2024
IS14.12.2024
[2025/21]
Former [2025/11]HR14.08.2024
PL14.08.2024
NO14.11.2024
RS14.11.2024
GR15.11.2024
IS14.12.2024
Former [2025/09]PL14.08.2024
NO14.11.2024
GR15.11.2024
IS14.12.2024
Former [2025/08]PL14.08.2024
NO14.11.2024
GR15.11.2024
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2010004332  (RAYMOND A LAMB LTD [GB], et al);
 [Y]US8981907  (LAVACHE STEVEN DAVID [GB]);
 [Y]CN209515199U  (SHENZHEN YIZHILIAN TECH CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.