EP4185504 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A TRAJECTORY OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ampere SAS 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt B.P. 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | [2024/15] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt B.P. 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DO, Anh-Lam 92160 ANTONY / FR | 02 /
HERMITTE, Thierry 78400 Chatou / FR | 03 /
LAUGIER, Christian 38330 Montbonnot Saint-Martin / FR | 04 /
MARTINET, Philippe 06160 Juan Les Pins / FR | 05 /
SERAFIM-GUARDINI, Luiz-Alberto 78330 Fontenay le Fleury / FR | 06 /
SPALANZANI, Anne 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. API : TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21742847.3 | 21.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021EP70320 | Priority number, date | FR20200007743 | 23.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007743 | [2023/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018110 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185504 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/095, B60W50/00, B60W60/00, B60W50/14, G08G1/16, B60W40/04 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B60W30/095 (EP);
B60W30/0956 (US);
B60W30/09 (US);
B60W30/0953 (US);
B60W40/04 (EP);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
B60W50/14 (EP);
B60W50/16 (US);
B60W60/0015 (EP,US);
G08G1/166 (EP);
B60W2050/0013 (EP);
B60W2050/146 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER TRAJEKTORIE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2023/22] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A TRAJECTORY OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE TRAJECTOIRE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 23.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102008005310 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024] - [0026] - [0029] , [0034] * * figure 6 *[I] 4; | [I]US2014067206 (PFLUG GOERG [DE]) [I] 1-3,5,8,9,11 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0020] , [0023] , [0025] - [0026] - [0053] - [0054] - [0057] * * claims 1,3,5,6,7,8,9,10,11 * * figures 2,3; tables 2,3,4 *; | [XI]US2014379167 (FLEHMIG FOLKO [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0019] - [0026] - [0031] - [0036] - [0040] * * claims 1,3,4,5,7,8 * [I] 2,4,5,10,11; | [I]WO2017142917 (ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO [US]) [I] 1,4,7,11 * paragraphs [0019] , [0043] - [0051] * * figure 3 * | by applicant | EP3342663 | - C. SCHWARZ, "On Computing time-to-collision for automation scénarios", Transportation Research Part F: Traffic Psychology and Behaviour, Vehicle Automation and Driver Behaviour, (20140000), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/j.trf.2014.06.015, pages 283 - 294, XP029105245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.trf.2014.06.015 | - "Association for the Advancement of Automotive Medicine: The Abbreviated Injury Scale 1990 Revision - Update", Barrington, Association for the Advancement of Automotive Medicine, (19980000), vol. 98 |