EP4182555 - VARIABLE-HEAD HYDROELECTRIC POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venturini Delsolaro, Ezio Via Sempione 2 28865 Crevoladossola (VB) / IT | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Marietti, Andrea, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21748951.7 | 13.07.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021IB56281 | Priority number, date | IT20200017482 | 17.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000017482 | [2023/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022013727 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4182555 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/08, E02B9/00 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
F03B13/08 (EP,US);
E02B9/00 (EP);
B63B2035/4466 (EP);
E02B9/06 (EP);
F05B2240/93 (EP,US);
Y02E10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | HYDROELEKTRISCHES KRAFTWERK MIT VARIABLEM KOPF | [2023/21] | English: | VARIABLE-HEAD HYDROELECTRIC POWER PLANT | [2023/21] | French: | CENTRALE HYDROÉLECTRIQUE À TÊTE VARIABLE | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 14.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR19028E (JOSEPH REYNAL [FR]) [X] 1,5-9* figure - *; | [XI]US2010284784 (FARB DANIEL [IL]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure 2 * [I] 4,7,9,10; | [XI]WO2018067970 (NATEL ENERGY INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0085]; figure - * [I] 4,7,10; | [XI]WO2018152208 (FREDA ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * figure - * [I] 3,4,10 |