EP4185765 - TURBINE WITH PRESSURISED CAVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Matthieu 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
DANTENY, Ulysse, Jacques, Bernard 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS 92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21752581.5 | 22.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021FR51374 | Priority number, date | FR20200007781 | 23.07.2020 Original published format: FR 2007781 | [2023/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018385 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185765 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08, F01D11/04, F01D11/24, F01D25/12, F01D25/24, F02C6/08, F01D1/26 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F01D11/24 (EP);
F01D5/08 (US);
F01D1/26 (EP,US);
F01D11/04 (EP);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP);
F01D5/084 (EP);
F02C6/08 (EP);
F02C7/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | TURBINE MIT DRUCKHOHLRÄUMEN | [2023/22] | English: | TURBINE WITH PRESSURISED CAVITIES | [2023/22] | French: | TURBINE À CAVITÉS PRESSURISÉES | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 20.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2938293 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 10 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2189624 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-11* figure 2 *; | [XY]US2019218913 (SEN ARNAB [IN], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0040]; figures 1,6 * [Y] 10 | by applicant | FR3021700 |