EP3994809 - MODULATION FORMATS WITH FRACTIONAL SPECTRAL EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciena Corporation 7035 Ridge Road Hanover, MD 21076 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIMER, Michael Ottawa Ontario K2K 0L1 / CA | 02 /
OVEIS GHARAN, Shahab San Jose California 95134 / US | 03 /
HARLEY, James Ottawa Ontario K2K 0L1 / CA | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21769807.5 | 03.09.2021 | [2022/19] | WO2021IB58066 | Priority number, date | US202017018495 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: US202017018495 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053922 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994809 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3994809 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/516, H04B10/532, H04B10/54 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04B10/5161 (EP,US);
H04B10/6162 (US);
H04B10/532 (EP,US);
H04B10/541 (EP);
H04L27/3405 (US);
H04L27/367 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULATIONSFORMATE MIT FRAKTIONIERTER SPEKTRALER EFFIZIENZ | [2022/19] | English: | MODULATION FORMATS WITH FRACTIONAL SPECTRAL EFFICIENCY | [2022/19] | French: | FORMATS DE MODULATION AVEC EFFICACITÉ SPECTRALE FRACTIONNAIRE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 17.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
IT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A] - KOJIMA KEISUKE ET AL, "Nonlinearity-tolerant time domain hybrid modulation for 4-8 bits/symbol based on 2A8PSK", 2017 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION (OFC), OSA, (20170319), pages 1 - 3, XP033101426 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AD] - MARTIN SJÖDIN ET AL, "Comparison of 128-SP-QAM with PM-16-QAM", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20120409), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1364/OE.20.008356, ISSN 1094-4087, page 8356, XP055134850 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.008356 | by applicant | US10735135 | - WINZER, "High-Spectral-Efficiency Optical Modulation Formats", Journal of Lightwave technology, (20120000), vol. 30, doi:10.1109/JLT.2012.2212180, XP011486096 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2012.2212180 | - AGRELLKARLSSON, "Power-Efficient Modulation Formats in Coherent Transmission Systems", Journal of Lightwave Technology, (20090000), vol. 27 | - SJODIN et al., "Comparison of 128-SP-QAM with PM-16-QAM", Optics Express, (20120000), vol. 20, doi:10.1364/OE.20.008356, XP055134850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.008356 |