EP4178584 - HYDROXYAPATITE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ZOLEDRONIC ACID AND DOXORUBICIN FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/20] | NOVEL TREATMENT REGIMEN OF CANCER | ||
[2023/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moroxite T AB Kung Oscars väg 11c 222 35 Lund / SE | [2023/38] |
Former [2023/20] | For all designated states Moroxite AB Brobyggargatan 4 298 31 Tollarp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIDGREN, Lars 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | 02 /
TÄGIL, Magnus 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | 03 /
RAINA, Deepak 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | 04 /
YANG, Liu 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21793863.8 | 05.10.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021EP77420 | Priority number, date | SE20200051170 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: SE 2051170 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022073990 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178584 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4178584 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/704, A61K31/675, A61P35/00, A61K9/14, A61K45/06, A61K9/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/143 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/20] | A61K31/704, A61K31/675, A61P35/00, A61K9/14, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | HYDROXYAPATIT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ZOLEDRONSÄURE UND DOXORUBICIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2023/36] | English: | HYDROXYAPATITE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ZOLEDRONIC ACID AND DOXORUBICIN FOR TREATING CANCER | [2023/36] | French: | COMPOSITION D'HYDROXYAPATITE COMPRENANT DE L'ACIDE ZOLÉDRONIQUE ET DE LA DOXORUBICINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/20] | NEUARTIGES BEHANDLUNGSSCHEMA FÜR KREBS | ||
Former [2023/20] | NOVEL TREATMENT REGIMEN OF CANCER | ||
Former [2023/20] | NOUVEAU RÉGIME DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 25.10.2023 | |
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 25.10.2023 | |
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 26.01.2024 | |
IS | 25.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009215729 (JOHNSON ERIN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * figures 1-9; claims 1-20 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0067] , [0082] , [0 89] * * examples 1-3 *; | [XYI]WO2013008240 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,12-14,18,19,22,23,26,28 * examples 1-4; claims 1-73 * * page 20, paragraph 4 * [Y] 1-28 [I] 8-11,20,24,25,27; | [XYI] - PIGNATELLO ROSARIO ET AL, "Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of a New Polymeric Conjugate and Nanocarrier with Osteotropic Properties", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL BIOMATERIALS, vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.3390/jfb3010079, (20120119), pages 79 - 99, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4031017/pdf/jfb-03-00079.pdf, XP055880989 [X] 1,2,4-6,12-14,18,19,22,23,26,27 * figures 1-14 * * Section 3, staring on page 91 * [Y] 1-28 [I] 7-11,21,24,25,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jfb3010079 | [XYI] - YUAN YE ET AL, "A multiple drug loaded, functionalized pH-sensitive nanocarrier as therapeutic and epigenetic modulator for osteosarcoma", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, vol. 10, no. 15497, doi:10.1038/s41598-020-72552-z, (20200923), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/s41598-020-72552-z.pdf, XP055857230 [X] 1,2,4-6,12,18,19,22,23,27,28 * abstract * * figures 1-15 * * Discussion, par. 1 * [Y] 1-28 [I] 7-11,13,21,24-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-020-72552-z | [Y] - AKOURY ELIE ET AL, "Anti-Tumor Effects of Low Dose Zoledronate on Lung Cancer-Induced Spine Metastasis", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MEDICINE, (20190814), vol. 8, no. 8, doi:10.3390/jcm8081212, page 1212, XP055881159 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jcm8081212 | [Y] - DEEPAK BUSHAN RAINA ET AL, "A Biphasic Calcium Sulphate/Hydroxyapatite Carrier Containing Bone Morphogenic Protein-2 and Zoledronic Acid Generates Bone", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20160518), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep26033, XP055457462 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 10, "Materials" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep26033 | Examination | WO2019206677 | - LIU YANG ET AL, "Sustained and controlled delivery of doxorubicin from an in-situ setting biphasic hydroxyapatite carrier for local treatment of a highly proliferative human osteosarcoma", ACTA BIOMATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 131, doi:10.1016/J.ACTBIO.2021.07.016, ISSN 1742-7061, (20210713), pages 555 - 571, (20210713), XP086746921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2021.07.016 | by applicant | - STEFAN WILHELM, Nature Reviews Materials | - KINAM PARK, Journal of Controlled Release |