EP4153834 - IMPROVEMENTS TO HINGES OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D&D Group Pty Ltd Unit 6, 4-6 Aquatic Drive Frenchs Forest, New South Wales 2086 / AU | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Tom Manly, New South Wales 2095 / AU | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21808932.4 | 19.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021AU50470 | Priority number, date | AU20200901623 | 20.05.2020 Original published format: AU 2020901623 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021232100 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153834 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
E05D7/0415 (EP,AU);
E05D7/04 (AU);
E05D7/0009 (US);
E05D7/043 (EP,AU);
E05D2007/0469 (EP,AU);
E05D2007/0484 (EP,AU);
E05Y2600/12 (US);
E05Y2600/14 (EP,AU,US);
E05Y2600/312 (EP,AU,US);
E05Y2600/314 (EP,AU,US);
E05Y2600/502 (EP);
E05Y2600/632 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN SCHARNIEREN ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2023/13] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO HINGES OR THE LIKE | [2023/13] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À DES CHARNIÈRES OU COMPOSANTS SIMILAIRES | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2615194 (KREINER SYLVESTER J) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0118050 (TEFO AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,5-14 *; | [A]US6286185 (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]EP1348826 (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0045]; figures 2-18 * [A] 9 [I] 8; | [A]GB2482722 (TROJAN HARDWARE & DESIGN LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* page 10, line 30 - page 15, line 12; figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]DE3813004 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [A] 1-23* Abstract; figures *; | [X]EP1348826 (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-23 * Abstract; figures 1-18; paragraphs 39-43 *; | [A]EP2949844 (WILH SCHLECHTENDAHL & SOEHNE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * Abstract; figures * | by applicant | US5584100 | EP1348826 | US2014075720 |