EP4241340 - CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARTING Electric Stiftung & Co. KG Patentabteilung Wilhelm-Harting-Str. 1 32339 Espelkamp / DE | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLIGE, Denny 32339 Espelkamp / DE | 02 /
WEN, Ensign Zhuhai, Guangdong, 519085 / CN | 03 /
BÖHMANN, Frank 32339 Espelkamp / DE | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21810917.1 | 04.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021DE100879 | Priority number, date | CN202011239802 | 09.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011239802 | CN202110282328 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110282328 | [2023/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022096065 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241340 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/621, H01R13/639, H01R13/52, H01R13/629, H01R13/645 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H01R13/639 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R13/5202 (CN,KR,US);
H01R13/5219 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R13/621 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/62933 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/631 (CN,KR);
H01R13/64 (CN,KR);
H01R13/6456 (EP,US);
H01R13/6581 (CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERBINDERBAUGRUPPE | [2023/37] | English: | CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY | [2023/37] | French: | MODULE DE CONNECTEUR | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 15.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |