EP4162957 - INFECTIOUS DRAINAGE TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MES Co., LTD. 10-1-2909, Tsukishima 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0052 / JP | [2023/31] |
Former [2023/15] | For all designated states Mec Co., Ltd. 10-1-2909, Tsukishima 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Takao Tokyo 104-0052 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Yozo Tokyo 104-0052 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21821626.5 | 09.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021JP22007 | Priority number, date | JP20200100441 | 09.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020100441 | [2023/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021251444 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162957 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, C02F1/50, C02F1/76, C02F1/78, E03C1/126, E03D9/03 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
A61L2/183 (EP);
C02F1/50 (US);
A61L11/00 (EP);
A61L2/18 (EP);
C02F1/008 (EP);
C02F1/76 (EP);
C02F1/763 (US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
E03C1/126 (EP,US);
E03D9/037 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP);
C02F2103/003 (EP,US);
C02F2103/005 (EP,US);
C02F2209/29 (EP);
C02F2209/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/15] | A61L2/18, C02F1/50, C02F1/76, C02F1/78, E03C1/126 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR INFEKTIÖSE DRAINAGE | [2023/15] | English: | INFECTIOUS DRAINAGE TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2023/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE DRAINAGE INFECTIEUX | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2023 | Translation filed | 04.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5429270 (TUMMINIA RONALD [US]); | [Y]WO2007009295 (IEONG WENG KUONG [CN], et al); | [IY]WO2013099333 (AIR WATER SAFETY SERVICE INC [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2003155768 (SANIKLEEN CORP, et al); | [A]JP2004024922 (UEDA TAKAO); | [A]JP2004190425 (HITACHI HOME & LIFE SOLUTIONS, et al); | [A]JP2015161095 (KYORITSU SEIYAKU KK); | [A]JP2018150417 (KOBAYASHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [A]US2019389756 (HUANG HUI [CN], et al); | [PXPA]JP2021037502 (UEDA TAKAO) | by applicant | JPS496094B |