EP4026074 - SIGNALING TIMEOUT AND COMPLETE DATA INPUTS IN CLOUD WORKFLOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SODAGAR, Iraj Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21828530.2 | 06.05.2021 | [2022/28] | WO2021US31027 | Priority number, date | US202063043660P | 24.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063043660 P | US202063087755P | 05.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063087755 P | US202117233788 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: US202117233788 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021262328 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026074 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q10/10, G06F9/48, G06F9/50 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G06F9/4887 (EP);
G06F9/485 (KR,US);
G06F9/30094 (KR);
G06F9/5038 (EP);
G06Q10/00 (EP);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q10/103 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG VON TIMEOUT- UND VOLLSTÄNDIGEN DATENEINGABEN IN CLOUD-WORKFLOWS | [2022/28] | English: | SIGNALING TIMEOUT AND COMPLETE DATA INPUTS IN CLOUD WORKFLOWS | [2022/28] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE TEMPORISATION ET D'ENTRÉES DE DONNÉES COMPLÈTES DANS DES FLUX DE TRAVAUX EN NUAGE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011145392 (DAWSON CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [4143] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0077] *; | [I]US9430280 (SHIH KATHRYN MARIE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020128062 (WENGER STEPHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0102] * | International search | [A]US2007150329 (BROOK JOHN C [AU], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2008229307 (MAEDA KAORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]US2011145392 (DAWSON CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]US9430280 (SHIH KATHRYN MARIE [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * , entire document especially col 15, lines 17-42, col 19, lines 27-58, col 23, lines 18-65, col 30, lines 65-67, col 31, lines 1-18, col 37, lines 32-67 *; | [A]US2020036798 (DIERCKENS KARL [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * | by applicant | US9430280 |