EP4174033 - STERILIZATION SYSTEM AND STERILIZATION METHOD FOR POTABLE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZOGUCHI, Kotaro Omachi-shi, Nagano 398-0004 / JP | 02 /
IDO, Yoshihiro Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 03 /
UETA, Etsuko Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 04 /
YUKI, Katsuya Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 05 /
SAKAMOTO, Junki Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 06 /
TAKAHASHI, Tokio Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0284 / JP | 07 /
OKUMURA, Kakuji Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 08 /
KIDA, Wataru Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0284 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21833983.6 | 29.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP24618 | Priority number, date | JP20200113487 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020113487 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004743 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174033 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/02, C02F1/44, A23L2/38, // C02F1/28 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C02F9/00 (EP);
A23L2/38 (EP);
C02F1/004 (EP);
C02F1/02 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F1/444 (EP);
C02F2209/005 (EP);
C02F2209/02 (EP);
C02F2209/44 (EP);
C02F2303/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | C02F1/02, C02F1/44, A23L2/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | STERILISATIONSSYSTEM UND STERILISATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR TRINKWASSER | [2023/18] | English: | STERILIZATION SYSTEM AND STERILIZATION METHOD FOR POTABLE WATER | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE STÉRILISATION D'EAU POTABLE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | Translation filed | 15.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 03.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5336926B (NOMURA MICRO SCIENCE KK) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0027] * | International search | [Y]JPH04234967 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0002] *; | [Y]JP2017047409 (OKUNAGARAGAWA-MEISUI INC, et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0201]-[0204], [0257] *; | [A]CN111056517 (DEQING CHOICE JUICE CO LTD) [A] 1-4* claim 10, paragraphs [0012], [0018], [0027], [0029] * | by applicant | JP5336926B | JP2017214134 |