EP4267116 - CELLULAR HEALTH NUTRITIONAL PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haleon US Holdings LLC 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2024/04] | For all designated states Haleon US IP LLC 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | ||
Former [2023/44] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULL, Caroline Felicity Adelaide, SA 5000 / AU | 02 /
FENECH, Michael North Brighton, SA 5048 / AU | 03 /
POXON, Scott William Richmond, VA 23220 / US | 04 /
VAN KLINKEN, Bernardus Jan-willem Warren, NJ 07059 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Haleon Patent Department 5 The Heights, Wellington Way Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0NY / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21848367.5 | 20.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021US64340 | Priority number, date | US202063128904P | 22.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063128904 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022140253 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4267116 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/01, A61K31/07, A61K31/12, A61K31/355, A61K31/375, A61K31/4172, A61K31/7048, A61K33/04, A61K38/05, A61P1/16, A61P9/00, A61P39/06, A61P43/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61K33/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/01 (EP,US);
A61K31/047 (US);
A61K31/07 (EP);
A61K31/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/4172 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K38/05 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/01, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4172, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/04, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | ERNÄHRUNGSPRODUKT FÜR DIE ZELLULÄRE GESUNDHEIT | [2023/44] | English: | CELLULAR HEALTH NUTRITIONAL PRODUCT | [2023/44] | French: | PRODUIT NUTRITIONNEL POUR LA SANTÉ CELLULAIRE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007088046 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0060] * * examples 1,3-5; claims 1-31 *; | [X]US2010278939 (GHARAGOZLOO PARVIZ [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066]; examples 1-12; claims 1-30 *; | [X]CN104544052 (GOU CHUNHU) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - FENECH MICHAEL ET AL, "Vitamins/minerals and genomic stability in humans", MUTATION RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010401), vol. 475, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0027-5107(01)00069-0, ISSN 0027-5107, pages 1 - 6, XP055899012 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0027-5107(01)00069-0 |