EP4075566 - PROCESS AUTOMATION SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING BATTERY CELL GRADES AND INTEGRATING BATTERY MODULE ASSEMBLY PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Heung-Kun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Choon-Kwon Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21856139.7 | 05.08.2021 | [2022/42] | WO2021KR10362 | Priority number, date | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200100691 | [2022/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022035133 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075566 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/344, B07C5/36, H01M10/04, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H01M50/213, H01M50/244, G01R31/385 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
B07C5/344 (EP);
H01M10/4221 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/244 (EP,CN);
H01M10/0404 (EP,KR,US);
B07C5/3412 (CN);
B07C5/36 (EP);
B07C5/361 (CN);
B07C5/362 (CN);
G01R31/3865 (EP,CN);
G01R31/396 (CN,US);
H01M10/0422 (EP);
H01M10/4207 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/4285 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP);
H01M50/213 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | H01M10/42, H01M10/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | PROZESSAUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON BATTERIEZELLENGÜTESTUFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION EINES BATTERIEMODULMONTAGEPROZESSES | [2022/42] | English: | PROCESS AUTOMATION SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING BATTERY CELL GRADES AND INTEGRATING BATTERY MODULE ASSEMBLY PROCESS | [2022/42] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AUTOMATISATION DE PROCESSUS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER DES CATÉGORIES D'ÉLÉMENTS DE BATTERIE ET D'INTÉGRER UN PROCESSUS D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | Translation filed | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2006117241 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]US2012133371 (TOOMRE ERIK [US], et al); | [A]CN109671967 (HARBIN ZHIMING SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD); | [XI]CN111438082 (SHENZHEN OU SHENG AUTOMATION CO LTD) | International search | [Y]KR101167096B (SMART HI TECH CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20150137583 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170016179 (XAVIS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR102039261B (SEO JEONG ROK [KR]); | [Y]KR102043112B (BAEK YOUNG JIN [KR], et al) | by applicant | KR20150049527 | KR20200100691 |