EP4202002 - SOLVENT-FREE COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPGSSC Co., Ltd 19, Yeocheon-ro 217beon-gil Nam-gu Ulsan 44714 / KR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Je Hyuk Ulsan 44473 / KR | 02 /
MOON, Hong Chul Ulsan 44711 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hyun Jik Ulsan 44041 / KR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21858509.9 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021KR10422 | Priority number, date | KR20200104766 | 20.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200104766 | [2023/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022039422 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202002 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C09D5/08, C09D7/40, C09D7/41, C09D7/63, C08K5/5415, C08K5/17 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C09D5/08 (EP,KR);
C09D163/00 (KR,US);
C08G59/24 (EP);
C08G59/5006 (EP,US);
C08G59/504 (EP);
C08K5/17 (KR);
C08K5/5415 (KR);
C09D5/028 (US);
C09D7/20 (US);
C09D7/40 (KR);
C09D7/41 (EP,KR);
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L63/00, C08K5/06, C08K5/5435 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTELFREIE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/26] | English: | SOLVENT-FREE COATING COMPOSITION | [2023/26] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT EXEMPTE DE SOLVANT | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | Translation filed | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007224362 (BRIAND REMI [US], et al); | [X]US2008224098 (TANG GUANGLIANG [US], et al); | [X]US2010040791 (FUNSTON RANDALL A [US]); | [X]DE112016002028T (NIPPON PAINT MARINE COATINGS CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US2018155571 (UJII TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH0649392 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO); | [A]KR20080059302 (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS [JP]); | [A]KR20130042706 (KUNSUL CHENICAL IND CO LTD [KR]); | [DY]KR20190067168 (JOTUN A [NO]); | [Y]KR20200063571 (CHO KWANG PAINT CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | JPH10211464 | JP2002080563 | EP1788048 | KR20190067168 |