EP4236517 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXTENDING PERIOD OF SELECTION WINDOW IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Woosuk Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
SEO, Hanbyul Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Seungmin Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21883148.5 | 18.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021KR14457 | Priority number, date | US202063094292P | 20.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063094292 P | [2023/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022086077 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236517 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W76/14, H04W74/0808, // H04W92/18, H04W76/28, H04W72/542, H04W72/40, H04W52/02, H04W4/40 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR);
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04W4/40 (EP,KR);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0248 (KR);
H04W52/028 (EP);
H04W72/542 (EP,KR);
H04W74/0808 (EP);
H04W76/28 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W76/28, H04W76/14, H04W4/40, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DER PERIODE EINES AUSWAHLFENSTERS IN NR V2X | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXTENDING PERIOD OF SELECTION WINDOW IN NR V2X | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTENSION DE PÉRIODE DE FENÊTRE DE SÉLECTION DANS NR V2X | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2023 | Translation filed | 16.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018145067 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [A]KR102103725B ; |