EP4242823 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Jonghyun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Bohyeon Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21892210.2 | 01.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021KR15607 | Priority number, date | KR20200149902 | 11.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200149902 | [2023/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022103040 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242823 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G06F1/16, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0486, G09G3/00, H04M1/02, H04M1/03, G06F3/147, G06F3/04883 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G06F1/1624 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/16 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1677 (EP);
G06F3/0486 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G09G3/035 (EP);
H04M1/0235 (EP);
H04M1/0237 (US);
H04M1/0241 (EP);
H04M1/0268 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP);
G09G2340/14 (EP);
G09G2340/145 (EP);
G09G2380/02 (EP);
H04M1/0264 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | G06F3/14, G06F1/16, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0486 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT FLEXIBLER ANZEIGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2023/37] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE À AFFICHAGE FLEXIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2023 | Translation filed | 07.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 23.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2881840 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20150096952 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0042]; claim 1; and figure 3. *; | [A]KR101581275B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0064]-[0066]; and figures 6a-6c. *; | [A]US2017003864 (YOSHINAKA KEI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 11-14; and figures 6-8. *; | [A]KR102066716B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0037]; claims 1-2; and figures 1a-1b. *; | [A]KR102115361B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-3; and figures 1-5. * |