EP4257890 - FREEZING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South 1-13-1, Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Satoshi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | 02 /
ONOZATO, Daiki Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21900548.5 | 29.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021JP43649 | Priority number, date | JP20200200370 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020200370 | [2023/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118795 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257890 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B25/005 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B2313/003 (EP);
F25B2313/0314 (EP);
F25B2600/0253 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP);
F25B2700/21161 (US);
F25B2700/2117 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | GEFRIERGERÄT | [2023/41] | English: | FREEZING APPARATUS | [2023/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONGÉLATION | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2023 | Translation filed | 01.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013165841 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]); | [XI]WO2014032672 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) | International search | [A]JP2017040396 (KANTO SEIKI CO) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0020]-[0024], [0036], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2017137044 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0110], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2019173986 (CORONA CORP) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0048], [0073], fig. 6(b) * | by applicant | JP2019020090 |