EP4273122 - ISOCYANATE COMPOUND PREPARATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanwha Solutions Corporation 86, Cheonggyecheon-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04541 / KR | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Ju Won Daejeon 34128 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Hyun Cheol Daejeon 34128 / KR | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21915887.0 | 30.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021KR20328 | Priority number, date | KR20200187830 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200187830 | [2023/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022146090 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273122 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C263/10, C07C263/16, C07C263/20, C07C265/14 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C07C263/20 (EP,KR);
C07C263/10 (EP,KR);
C07C263/16 (KR);
C07C265/14 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/10, C07C265/14 (EP);
C07C263/20, C07C265/14 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ISOCYANATVERBINDUNG | [2023/45] | English: | ISOCYANATE COMPOUND PREPARATION METHOD | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN COMPOSÉ ISOCYANATE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | Translation filed | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR970001071 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS INC.) [A] 1-15* See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20080033495 (BASF SE [DE]) [Y] 3 * See paragraphs [0068] and [0069]. *; | [Y]KR20120038435 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0013], [0054] and [0064]. *; | [A]US2017101367 (KNAUF THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20190142642 (HANWHA CHEMICAL CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0024], [0026]-[0029], [0032], [0037]-[0039] and [0045]; and claims 1 and 2. * |