EP4382834 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Chitose Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 21952721.5 | 03.08.2021 | [2024/24] | WO2021JP28744 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023012891 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382834 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/26 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B2313/007 (EP);
F25B2313/0231 (EP);
F25B2313/0272 (EP);
F25B2313/0276 (EP);
F25B2400/13 (EP);
F25B41/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2024/24] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2024/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CYCLE DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2024 | Translation filed | 29.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 11.06.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2011112233 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO2017145219 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2019215916 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2020148254 (FUJI KOKI KK); | [A]WO2021106084 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011112233 |