EP4052767 - MULTI-FUNCTION CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schauer Nilüfer Am Kratt 2a 22926 Aahrensburg / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schauer, Nilüfer 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 02 /
Schauer, Markus 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 03 /
Rembold, Jürgen 74348 Lauffen / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Kern, Hedwig Ackermannstrasse 33 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22000045.9 | 03.03.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | DE20211001184 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021001184 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052767 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/18, B63B29/12 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A47C9/002 (EP);
A47C3/027 (EP);
A63B21/0608 (EP);
A63B21/0615 (EP);
A63B21/1609 (EP);
A63B21/4027 (EP);
A63B22/18 (EP);
A63B2071/026 (EP);
A63B2208/0233 (EP);
A63B2210/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONSSTUHL | [2022/36] | English: | MULTI-FUNCTION CHAIR | [2022/36] | French: | CHAISE MULTIFONCTION | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US164240 (WERTHEIM) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US3863587 (BOSNICH ANGELO J) [X] 1-3 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US6666802 (RASMUSSEN AARON P [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4210097 | DE202009011135U | KR20110089733 | WO2019074903 |