EP4036466 - ASSEMBLY OF LIGHT MODULE, LENS AND REFLECTOR WITH DOUBLE BAYONET FASTENING, METHOD OF ASSEMBLY OF ASSEMBLY AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Light NV Muizelstraat 2 8560 Wevelgem (Moorsele) / BE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN MAELE, Janwillem 8560 Wevelgem / BE | 02 /
AMELOOT, Peter 8560 Wevelgem / BE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 22153368.0 | 26.01.2022 | [2022/31] | Priority number, date | BE20210005069 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: BE 202105069 | [2022/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036466 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21V13/04, F21V17/14, // F21Y115/10 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
F21V17/14 (EP);
F21V13/04 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON LICHTMODUL, LINSE UND REFLEKTOR MIT DOPPELTEM BAJONETTVERSCHLUSS, VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAU DER ANORDNUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2022/31] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF LIGHT MODULE, LENS AND REFLECTOR WITH DOUBLE BAYONET FASTENING, METHOD OF ASSEMBLY OF ASSEMBLY AND USE | [2022/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MODULE D'ÉCLAIRAGE, LENTILLE ET RÉFLECTEUR AVEC DOUBLE FIXATION À BAYON, MÉTHODE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE L'ENSEMBLE ET UTILISATION | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 25.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011007515 (FARMER TODD [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 10 *; | [A]US2013033872 (RANDOLPH DAVID N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0104] * * figures 19-21,47,48 *; | [XI]US2013083525 (KOO WON-HOE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0011] , [0026] * * figures 1,4 * [I] 5,10,14,15; | [A]ITBS20120050 (TARGETTI SANKEY SPA) [A] 1-15 * figures 7-9 * | by applicant | US2013083525 |