blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4218948

EP4218948 - CABLE ANCHOR FOR A CABLE HOLDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.06.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2024New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APP Dachgarten GmbH
Jurastraße 21
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
[2023/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Csizmadia, Peter
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2023/31]
Representative(s)Gosdin, Carstensen & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaftgesellschaft mbB
Adam-Stegerwald-Straße 6
97422 Schweinfurt / DE
[2023/31]
Application number, filing date22153897.828.01.2022
[2023/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4218948
Date:02.08.2023
Language:DE
[2023/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2022
ClassificationIPC:A62B35/00, E04G21/32, F16G11/06
[2023/31]
CPC:
A62B35/0043 (EP); A62B35/0056 (EP); A62B35/0068 (EP);
E04G21/3295 (EP); F16G11/06 (EP); F16G11/14 (EP);
F16B5/0225 (EP); F16B5/025 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SEILANKER EINER SEILHALTEVORRICHTUNG[2023/31]
English:CABLE ANCHOR FOR A CABLE HOLDING DEVICE[2023/31]
French:ANCRAGE DE CÂBLE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE CÂBLE[2023/31]
Examination procedure13.03.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.202403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2819923  (DOYLE ANDERSON) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 21 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0527695  (MURE ETS [FR]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 56 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 30 ** figures 1-3 *;
 [I]US6263547  (ANDERSSON THOMMY [SE]) [I] 1-8 * column 1, lines 9-26 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 7 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE202011004057U  (GRUEN GMBH SPEZIALMASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0030] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP2476463  (INNOTECH HOLDING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0015] * * figures 1-4 *
by applicantWO2014127760
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.