EP4050084 - LIQUID-CRYSTAL MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Jing SHANGHAI 201206 / CN | 02 /
Zhao, Ping SHANGHAI 201206 / CN | 03 /
Choi, Chang-Suk SHANGHAI 201206 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 22158406.3 | 24.02.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | EP20210159636 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21159636 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050084 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/30, C09K19/34, C09K19/04, C09K19/12 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
C09K19/3098 (EP,KR);
C09K19/3003 (KR,US);
C09K19/46 (CN);
C09K19/12 (US);
C09K19/0403 (US);
C09K19/3066 (KR);
C09K19/3405 (KR);
C09K19/3491 (EP,KR);
G02F1/1333 (CN);
C09K2019/0414 (US);
C09K2019/0448 (EP,US);
C09K2019/122 (EP,KR);
C09K2019/123 (US);
C09K2019/3004 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3009 (EP);
C09K2019/301 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3015 (US);
C09K2019/3016 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLMEDIUM | [2022/35] | English: | LIQUID-CRYSTAL MEDIUM | [2022/35] | French: | SUPPORT À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN106010580B (SHIJIAZHUANG CHENGZHI YONGHUA DISPLAY MATERIALS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * paragraphs [0076] , [0080] - [0083]; examples 8, 9; claim - * [Y] 3,6 [I] 1-15; | [Y]TW202014504 (SHIJIAZHUANG CHENGZHI YONGHUA DISPLAY MATERIAL CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 3,6* CLG-n-Om, Sb-CpO-O4, Sc-CpO-O4, PP-5-1;; example -; claim - *; | [XYI]US2020199451 (SAKAMOTO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-15 * examples 13-15; claim - * [Y] 3,6 [I] 1-15 | by applicant | DE3534777 | DE3534778 | DE3534780 | DE4342280 | JPH07181439 | EP0667555 | EP0673986 | DE19528106 | WO9623851 | DE19509410 | DE19528107 | WO9628521 | DE19541820 | WO9800428 | GB2328207 | WO0206265 | WO0206196 | WO0206195 | WO0234739 | WO02094805 | US6781665 | - S.H. JUNG et al., Jpn. J. Appl. Phys., (20040000), vol. 43, no. 3, page 1028 | - S.H. LEE et al., Appl. Phys. Lett., (19980000), vol. 73, no. 20, pages 2882 - 2883 | - S.H. LEE et al., Liquid Crystals, (20120000), vol. 39, no. 9, pages 1141 - 1148 | - Pure Appl. Chem., (20010000), vol. 73, no. 5, page 888 | - C. TSCHIERSKEG. PELZLS. DIELE, Angew. Chem., (20040000), vol. 116, pages 6340 - 6368 | EP20010038941 | DE19843425503 | DE19853534779 |