EP4056340 - CUTTING AND SPLITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT, NL | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uniforest, D.o.o. Latkova vas 81D 3312 Prebold / SI | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polak, Marko 3303 Gomilsko / SI | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Sveticic, Andrej Patentna pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22159070.6 | 28.02.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | SI20210000039 | 12.03.2021 Original published format: SI 202100039 | [2022/37] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056340 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4056340 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B27B5/10, B27B5/18, B27G21/00, B27L7/00, B27L7/06, B27G19/02 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B27B5/10 (EP);
B27B5/18 (EP);
B27G21/00 (EP);
B27L7/00 (EP);
B27L7/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | B27B5/10, B27B5/18, B27G19/02, // B27L7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRENN- UND SPALTMASCHINE | [2023/29] | English: | CUTTING AND SPLITTING MACHINE | [2022/37] | French: | COUPEUSE-FENDEUSE | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/37] | SCHNEID- UND SPALTMASCHINE | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3512793 (HOELZ OTTO MASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 7, line 23 - page 11, line 16 ** figure - * |