EP4092645 - INCREASE IN THE SUCTION PERFORMANCE OF AN INTAKE SMOKE ALARM (ASD) TO SHORTEN THE TRANSPORT TIME FROM A DETECTED MINIMUM SIGNAL LEVEL VALUE WITHOUT OUTPUT OF AN INTERRUPTION MESSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Martin 8180 Bülach / CH | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22159123.3 | 28.02.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | EP20210174278 | 18.05.2021 Original published format: EP 21174278 | [2022/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092645 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/113, G08B17/10 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G08B17/10 (EP,CN,US);
G01N1/24 (US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G08B17/113 (EP);
G08B25/08 (CN);
G08B25/10 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHÖHUNG DER ANSAUGLEISTUNG BEI EINEM ANSAUGRAUCHMELDER (ASD) ZUR VERKÜRZUNG DER TRANSPORTZEIT AB EINEM DETEKTIERTEN MINDESTSIGNALPEGELWERT OHNE AUSGABE EINER UNTERBRUCHSMELDUNG | [2022/47] | English: | INCREASE IN THE SUCTION PERFORMANCE OF AN INTAKE SMOKE ALARM (ASD) TO SHORTEN THE TRANSPORT TIME FROM A DETECTED MINIMUM SIGNAL LEVEL VALUE WITHOUT OUTPUT OF AN INTERRUPTION MESSAGE | [2022/47] | French: | AUGMENTATION DE LA PUISSANCE D'ASPIRATION POUR UN DÉTECTEUR DE FUMÉE PAR ASPIRATION (ASD) PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE LE TEMPS DE TRANSPORT À UNE VALEUR DE NIVEAU DE SIGNAL MINIMUM DÉTECTÉ SANS ÉMETTRE DE MESSAGE D'INTERRUPTION | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1006500 (PITTWAY CORP [US]); | [YA]EP1638062 (HEKATRON TECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [YA]EP2244236 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | [YDA]EP2407946 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) | by applicant | EP2244236 | EP2407946 |