EP4067619 - TWO-STAGE SCREW COMPRESSOR AND AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Hu Shanghai, 201206 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22159827.9 | 02.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | CN202110319342 | 25.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110319342 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4067619 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4067619 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01C21/00, F04C18/16, F04C23/00, F04C29/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
F04C18/16 (EP,CN,US);
F01C21/007 (EP);
F04C23/001 (EP,CN);
F04C23/02 (CN);
F04C29/005 (EP,CN,US);
F04C2240/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGER SCHRAUBENVERDICHTER UND KLIMAANLAGE | [2022/40] | English: | TWO-STAGE SCREW COMPRESSOR AND AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2022/40] | French: | COMPRESSEUR À VIS À DEUX ÉTAGES ET SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION D'AIR | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS614889 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10* figures 4-9; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5795136 (OLSAKER OLEIF [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 7 - line 46; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2007040294 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2012251372 (NISHIMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-4 * |