EP4056396 - AXLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A GEAR REDUCTION MODULE WITH MULTIPLE GEAR SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cradit, Jeremy Troy / US | 02 /
Bofferding, Nick Troy / US | 03 /
Zueski, David Troy / US | 04 /
Martin, Robert Troy / US | 05 /
LaMothe, Eric Troy / US | 06 /
Keeney, Christopher Troy / US | 07 /
Hayes, Brian Troy / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Whitfield, Jack Stephen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22159910.3 | 03.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | US202117197390 | 10.03.2021 Original published format: US202117197390 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056396 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/00, B60K17/08 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
B60K1/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60K17/08 (EP,US);
B60K17/04 (CN);
B60K17/165 (CN);
F16H3/66 (US);
B60K2001/001 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/14 (EP);
F16H2200/2007 (US);
F16H2200/201 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACHSANORDNUNG MIT EINEM UNTERSETZUNGSMODUL MIT MEHREREN GETRIEBESÄTZEN | [2022/37] | English: | AXLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A GEAR REDUCTION MODULE WITH MULTIPLE GEAR SETS | [2022/37] | French: | ENSEMBLE ESSIEU COMPORTANT UN MODULE DE RÉDUCTION D'ENGRENAGE AVEC PLUSIEURS ENSEMBLES D'ENGRENAGES | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012142474 (TROENNBERG GABRIEL [SE], et al); | [AD]US2019054816 (GARCIA PEDRO [US], et al); | [A]US2019054817 (GARCIA PEDRO [US], et al) | by applicant | US2019054816 |