EP4064242 - METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF TRAFFIC SITUATIONS WITH LIMITED GAP GEOMETRY AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voltmer, Jörg 30559 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Hoppmann, Hendrik 38110 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Köstermann, Janis 10557 Berlin / DE | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22160948.0 | 09.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | DE202110202766 | 22.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021202766 | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064242 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967, G08G1/0968, G08G1/16, H04W4/44 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G08G1/162 (EP);
B60W30/0956 (CN);
G01C21/3461 (US);
B60W40/12 (CN);
G01C21/3492 (US);
G01C21/3605 (US);
G08G1/0965 (CN);
G08G1/0967 (EP);
G08G1/096791 (US);
G08G1/096838 (EP);
G08G1/165 (EP);
G08G1/166 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | G08G1/16, H04W4/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VERKEHRSSITUATIONEN MIT EINGESCHRÄNKTER DURCHFAHRTSGEOMETRIE UND FAHRZEUG | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF TRAFFIC SITUATIONS WITH LIMITED GAP GEOMETRY AND VEHICLE | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES SITUATIONS DE CIRCULATION À GÉOMÉTRIE DE PASSAGE RESTREINTE ET VÉHICULE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 02.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]DE102016202361 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XD] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031] *[A] 3-6; | [XDI]DE102018206667 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XD] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 3-6 | by applicant | DE102014221895 | DE102016202361 | DE102018206667 | DE102019205166 |