EP4062989 - CHUTE, IN PARTICULAR A WATER CHUTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquarena Holding GmbH Am Mühlweg 8 71131 Jettingen / DE | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Rainer 71106 Magstadt / DE | 02 /
ZEBISCH, Florian 73540 Heubach-Lautern / DE | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte PartG mbB Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/39] | Patentanwälte Mammel und Maser PartG mbB Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 22161963.8 | 14.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | DE202110107558 | 25.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021107558 | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062989 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4062989 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63G21/10 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A63G21/18 (EP,US);
A63G21/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RUTSCHE, INSBESONDERE WASSERRUTSCHE | [2022/39] | English: | CHUTE, IN PARTICULAR A WATER CHUTE | [2022/39] | French: | TOBOGGAN, NOTAMMENT TOBOGGAN AQUATIQUE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2002142851 (HUNTER RICHARD D [CA]); | [AD]US2005075180 (DUBETA DAVID J [CA]); | [A]DE202007014719U (HARTWIGSEN FREITZEITANLAGEN GM [DE]) | Examination | US2022305394 | by applicant | US2002142851 | US2005075180 |