EP4036910 - DYNAMIC AND/OR CONTEXT-SPECIFIC HOT WORDS TO INVOKE AUTOMATED ASSISTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASADO, Diego Melendo Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Trichard, Louis, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 22163684.8 | 21.08.2018 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036910 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/183, G10L15/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G10L15/00 (EP);
G10L15/183 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/16 (KR);
G10L15/24 (EP,KR);
G10L15/26 (KR);
G10L15/22 (US);
G10L2015/223 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE UND/ODER KONTEXTSPEZIFISCHE SCHLÜSSELWÖRTER ZUM AUFRUFEN EINES AUTOMATISIERTEN ASSISTENTEN | [2022/31] | English: | DYNAMIC AND/OR CONTEXT-SPECIFIC HOT WORDS TO INVOKE AUTOMATED ASSISTANT | [2022/31] | French: | MOTS-CLÉS DYNAMIQUES ET/OU SPÉCIFIQUES AU CONTEXTE POUR APPELER UN ASSISTANT AUTOMATISÉ | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 23.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18773684.8 / EP3631793 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014122059 (PATEL MUKESH [US], et al) [X] 1,11,14 * paragraphs [0059] - [0078] * [I] 2-10; | [X]US2015053779 (ADAMEK MARTIN [CZ], et al) [X] 1,11,14 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086]; figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0125] *; | [A]US2017193996 (ZUREK ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] *; | [A]WO2017141530 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0047] * |