EP4261012 - THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE PIPE AND METHOD OF MAKING A FLEXIBLE THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fibron Pipe GesmbH Gollensdorf 24 4300 St. Valentin / AT | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keßler, Andreas 82049 Pullach im Isartal / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Ege Lee & Roider Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Wagenfeld-Straße 24 80807 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22167831.1 | 12.04.2022 | [2023/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261012 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/58, B29D23/00, B32B27/00, F16L9/16 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B29D23/001 (EP);
B29C53/58 (EP);
B32B1/08 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
F16L9/128 (EP);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] |
Former [2023/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN, THERMOPLASTISCHEN VERBUNDROHRS SOWIE THERMOPLASTISCHES VERBUNDROHR | [2023/42] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE PIPE AND METHOD OF MAKING A FLEXIBLE THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE PIPE | [2023/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TUBE COMPOSITE THERMOPLASTIQUE SOUPLE, AINSI QUE TUBE COMPOSITE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 17.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3654967 (ATWELL WILLIAM J, et al); | [A]US5893956 (PERRY JR MARNEY DUNMAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2008115857 (DEEPFLEX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010026749 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]DE102011017328 (HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH [DE]); | [XI]US2014238977 (DYKSTERHOUSE JOEL A [US]) | by applicant | WO9507428 | WO2017048117 |