EP4101546 - CUP-SHAPED JET NOZZLE AND JET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansgrohe SE Auestraße 5-9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bilger, Marcel 78628 Rottweil / DE | 02 /
Kinle, Ulrich 77773 Schenkenzell / DE | 03 /
Wöhrle, Markus 77761 Schiltach / DE | 04 /
Jonat, Pascal 77756 Hausach / DE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22175482.3 | 25.05.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | DE202110205915 | 10.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021205915 | [2022/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101546 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4101546 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/18, B05B15/528, B05B1/32 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B05B1/185 (EP,CN);
B05B1/3006 (US);
B05B12/088 (US);
B05B15/528 (EP,CN);
E03C1/0404 (CN);
B05B1/323 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TOPFFÖRMIGE BRAUSESTRAHLAUSTRITTSDÜSE UND BRAUSE | [2022/50] | English: | CUP-SHAPED JET NOZZLE AND JET | [2022/50] | French: | BUSE DE SORTIE DE JET DE POMMEAU DE DOUCHE EN FORME DE POT ET POMMEAU DE DOUCHE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2003062426 (GREGORY GEORGE RICHARD [GB], et al); | [A]CN107029907 (TOTO LTD); | [AD]DE102016225987 (HANSGROHE SE [DE]); | [A]EP3517212 (HANSGROHE SE [DE]); | [A]CN110523548 (XIAMEN OSHINCE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD ) | by applicant | DE310182008 | DE4039337 | WO9522407 | US2003062426 | EP1700636 | DE102016225987 |