EP4109485 - REMOTE CONTROLLED MINIATURE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH HELICAL GEAR AND DC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 25.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | 25.08.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Boston One Campus 800 Federal Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEEGE, Dennis W. Cedar Rapids, IA / US | 02 /
FAIK, Salaheddine Marion, IA / US | 03 /
MITTELSTADT, Chad R. Cedar Rapids, IA / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22179791.3 | 20.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | US202117353888 | 22.06.2021 Original published format: US202117353888 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4109485 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4109485 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/70, H01H3/26 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H01H3/264 (EP);
H01H3/26 (US);
H01H3/40 (US);
H01H71/70 (EP);
H01H2003/266 (EP);
H01H2227/036 (US);
H01H2231/032 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNGESTEUERTER MINIATURLEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT SCHRÄGVERZAHNTEM GETRIEBE UND GLEICHSTROMMOTOR | [2022/52] | English: | REMOTE CONTROLLED MINIATURE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH HELICAL GEAR AND DC MOTOR | [2022/52] | French: | DISJONCTEUR MINIATURE TÉLÉCOMMANDÉ AVEC ENGRENAGE HÉLICOÏDAL ET MOTEUR CC | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 24.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3028812 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 2-12* page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US5861784 (HEISE JAMES ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 2-12 * column 5, line 57 - column 10, line 53; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009167100 (BROWN SCOTT R [US], et al) [A] 2-12 * page 2, paragraph 0018 - page 3, paragraph 0022; figures 1, 2 * |