EP4311861 - DNA-STABILIZED METAL CLUSTER-BASED NUCLEIC ACID-SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Nicolas 97070 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
Witzel, Patrick 97074 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Meinhardt, Jürgen 97450 Arnstein / DE | 04 /
Heinrich, Doris 63875 Mespelbrunn / DE | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Ulrich, Thomas Franz, et al Gleiss Große Schrell & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 22187343.3 | 27.07.2022 | [2024/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4311861 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6816 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP);
C12Q1/6834 (US);
C12Q1/689 (US);
C12Q1/701 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2525/301, C12Q2563/107, C12Q2563/137 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DNA-STABILISIERTER METALL-CLUSTER-BASIERTER NUKLEINSÄURESENSOR | [2024/05] | English: | DNA-STABILIZED METAL CLUSTER-BASED NUCLEIC ACID-SENSOR | [2024/05] | French: | CAPTEUR D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE BASÉ SUR UN CLUSTER MÉTALLIQUE STABILISÉ PAR ADN | [2024/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005287548 (BAO GANG [US], et al) [A] 1-16* see whole doc., esp. claims, Figure 1 and par. 59 *; | [I]US2011212540 (YEH HSIN-CHIH [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims and Figures *; | [I]WO2015007293 (UNIV COPENHAGEN [DK], et al) [I] 1-16 * see whole doc., esp. claims and Figures *; | [I] - WEIWEI GUO ET AL, "Highly Sequence-Dependent Formation of Fluorescent Silver Nanoclusters in Hybridized DNA Duplexes for Single Nucleotide Mutation Identification", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20100127), vol. 132, no. 3, doi:10.1021/ja907075s, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 932 - 934, XP055148449 [I] 1-16 * see whole doc., esp. Scheme 1, Figures 1 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja907075s | [A] - PATRICK R. O’NEILL ET AL, "Hairpins with Poly-C Loops Stabilize Four Types of Fluorescent Ag n :DNA", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (20090319), vol. 113, no. 11, doi:10.1021/jp809274m, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 4229 - 4233, XP055148490 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp809274m |